U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Smith v. Lowe's Stores Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.