U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Michel et al v. Mr. McTighe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 01, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.