U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Cowan v. Langton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 14, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 14, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.