U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Rezatto 3, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 12, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 28, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 27, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 02, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.