U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Zrowka v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 02, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.