U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:02-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.