U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Barcheers v. Yuskel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Response - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 15, 2022: [Claim]
  • September 15, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • August 30, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • August 30, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 20, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 28, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2022: [Claim]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 04, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 17, 2022: [Claim]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 09, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 09, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 04, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • February 02, 2022: [Claim]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 14, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 14, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 12, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • January 11, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 21, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • December 20, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • December 20, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 20, 2021: [Crossclaim]
  • December 10, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • November 15, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 25, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • September 22, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • September 22, 2021: [Crossclaim]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Remark]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.