U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camphouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.