U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allenby et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.