U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Vacate]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.