U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Bitco General Insurance Corporation v. Wesco Operating, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 03, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.