U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moskaloff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Exparte Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.