U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Estavilla v. The Goodman Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.