U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.