U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mittens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 04, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 22, 2021: [Revoke]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.