U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haywood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Suppress ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.