U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • June 09, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Appear]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [In Limine ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.