U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.