U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elkshoulder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.