U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Bearcomesout v. Mr. McTighe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • December 30, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 30, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 01, 2022: [Suggestion of Death]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2021: [Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.