U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Baker v. Mr. McTighe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.