U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Peltier v. Mr. McTighe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Stay]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • June 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Suggestion of Death]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Joinder]
  • April 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.