U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Mahseelah v. Mr. McTighe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Suggestion of Death]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.