U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harwood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.