U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.