U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Save the Bull Trout et al v. United States Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 08, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 04, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 04, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.