U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duval, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Strike - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.