U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Mather et al v. McLean and Associates et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.