U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.