U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schulz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.