U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Ryan v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 08, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.