U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.