U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Lyons v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Modify - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Remark]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Contempt - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.