U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Perkins v. Walmart Stores, Inc., Store No. 7199 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.