U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Such
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.