U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00045
  • Case Name: LeProwse Contracting et al v. Terrio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 09, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • June 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.