U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05100-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Carlson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • June 24, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.