U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Eckart et al v. Miles City, Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • August 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Errata - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.