U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Markel American Insurance Company v. Clearview Horizon, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Statement - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Statement - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 26, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 13, 2022: [Counterclaim]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 03, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Intervene]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 22, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 11, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.