U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Latray v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 30, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 11, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.