U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00051
  • Case Name: White v. Preventice Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Remark]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.