U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Boyd v. Knudsen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Reconsideration]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 15, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.