U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Attorney General of the State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 17, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 15, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.