U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Fink v. State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 05, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Jury Demand]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.