U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Haithcox v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Contempt - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Entry of Default]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.