U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00068
  • Case Name: The City of Miles City v. Eckart Trucking, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 06, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 09, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Remand]
  • July 09, 2021: [Entry of Default]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 15, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.