U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Billy v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 16, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.