U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wehner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2021: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.