U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuellar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 12, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 30, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.