U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Kaarma v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Requiring State to Respond in Habeas Case - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 17, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.